NY S00269 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - PRINT NUMBER 269A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - PRINT NUMBER 269A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the contribution that a resident taxpayer may make to family tuition accounts during a taxable year.
Title
Increases the contribution that a resident taxpayer may make to family tuition accounts during a taxable year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 269A |
2024-04-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |