NY S00352 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no retail licensee for on-premises consumption shall intentionally adulterate, dilute or fortify the contents of any container of alcoholic beverages as received from the manufacturer or wholesaler.
Title
Provides that no retail licensee for on-premises consumption shall intentionally adulterate, dilute or fortify the contents of any container of alcoholic beverages as received from the manufacturer or wholesaler.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7166 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 352 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 352A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.665 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07166 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.224