NY S00377 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a voluntary chaplaincy program for the public schools; applies to all school districts and supervisory districts; provides for chaplains to serve without compensation and for no fees to be charged by the districts; requires parental consent to refer a pupil under eighteen years of age; directs the commissioner of education to promulgate rules and regulations to implement the program.
Title
Provides for the establishment of a voluntary chaplaincy program for the public schools; applies to all school districts and supervisory districts; provides for chaplains to serve without compensation and for no fees to be charged by the districts; requires parental consent to refer a pupil under eighteen years of age; directs the commissioner of education to promulgate rules and regulations to implement the program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-03-29 | Senate | DEFEATED IN EDUCATION |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01112 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to education