NY S00377 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - PRINT NUMBER 377B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - PRINT NUMBER 377B
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the education department to produce an annual report regarding state workforce projections and education credential production.
Title
Requires the education department to produce an annual report regarding state workforce projections and education credential production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 377B |
2016-01-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-08-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 377A |
2015-08-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05575 (Same As) 2016-01-15 - print number 5575b