NY S00453 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a biennial budgeting system for the state of New York replacing the state annual budget process.
Title
Provides for the establishment of a biennial budgeting system for the state of New York replacing the state annual budget process.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-26 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2011-04-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-04-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 453A |
2011-04-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-18 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03163 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - to attorney-general for opinion