NY S00499 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes fine for violations by employment agencies to up to $500 a day and a class A misdemeanor for 3 or more violations in 5 years.
Title
Changes fine for violations by employment agencies to up to $500 a day and a class A misdemeanor for 3 or more violations in 5 years.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2011-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |