NY S00499 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of the offense of criminal trespass in the second degree.
Title
Expands the definition of the offense of criminal trespass in the second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1302 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03987 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes