NY S00530 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an assault of a child where the defendant has a previous conviction for an assault or an attempted assault of a child shall be an assault in the first degree.
Title
Provides that an assault of a child where the defendant has a previous conviction for an assault or an attempted assault of a child shall be an assault in the first degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.627 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02623 (Same As) 2013-07-29 - signed chap.172