NY S00544 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides relief on statewide central registrar clearance fees for tax exempt organizations and that the fee of twenty-five dollars shall not apply to tax-exempt not-for-profit child care providers registered as a federal 501 c(3) charitable organization.
Title
Provides relief on statewide central registrar clearance fees for tax exempt organizations and that the fee of twenty-five dollars shall not apply to tax-exempt not-for-profit child care providers registered as a federal 501 c(3) charitable organization.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. George Latimer [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1378 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1385 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03058 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to children and families