NY S00547 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-07 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the town board of any town, exclusive of suburban towns and towns having a population exceeding fifty thousand, may by local law, ordinance, order, rule or regulation establish maximum speed limits on town highways which have been classified by the department of transportation as local roads and which are outside of villages.
Title
Provides that the town board of any town, exclusive of suburban towns and towns having a population exceeding fifty thousand, may by local law, ordinance, order, rule or regulation establish maximum speed limits on town highways which have been classified by the department of transportation as local roads and which are outside of villages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.136 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.600 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03481 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation