NY S00581 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue use of certain park land and convey it to the St. Michael's cemetery.
Title
Authorizes the city of New York to discontinue use of certain park land and convey it to the St. Michael's cemetery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.923 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03535 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to cities