NY S00674 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Title
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A459 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.385 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00459 (Same As) 2021-11-16 - signed chap.629