NY S00689 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.
Title
Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4319 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.101 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04319 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - signed chap.806