NY S00701 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1140A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1140A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the women veterans advisory committee to support and assist the Division of Veterans' Services in locating, educating, and advocating for all women veterans in this state.
Title
Relates to creating the women veterans advisory committee to support and assist the Division of Veterans' Services in locating, educating, and advocating for all women veterans in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1140A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 701A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.151 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01140 (Same As) 2021-11-11 - approval memo.36