NY S00706 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to distinctive plates for medal of honor recipients; removes the word "congressional" from distinctive plates; provides for the reissuance of plates to persons assigned distinctive plates for medal of honor recipients.
Title
Relates to distinctive plates for medal of honor recipients; removes the word "congressional" from distinctive plates; provides for the reissuance of plates to persons assigned distinctive plates for medal of honor recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.139 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.30 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04323 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation