NY S00720 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from December 1, 2018 to December 1, 2021, the expiration of the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional mortgage recording tax.
Title
Extends from December 1, 2018 to December 1, 2021, the expiration of the authority of the county of Essex to impose an additional mortgage recording tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.14 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.15 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | substituted for a211 |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.83 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00211 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14