NY S00797 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a central registry of child care service complaints in New York city.
Title
Establishes a central registry of child care service complaints in New York city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.325 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 797A |
2017-02-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |