NY S00930 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes time periods for the stages of determining and approving environmental impact statements.
Title
Establishes time periods for the stages of determining and approving environmental impact statements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.65 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.855 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |