NY S00967 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the taxation of certain lands owned by the state constituting a state park; provides that if the land constitutes a state park and the average daily state park attendance for the preceding year exceeded twenty-five percent of the municipal population as determined by the most recent census data; the state-owned land constitutes ten percent or more of the total land contained within the municipality; the municipality provides or pays for first responder police protection and either pays or provides for the cost of first responder fire protection or the residents of the municipality make direct payments to a fire protection district responsible for protecting the state park and its visitors; and the principal entrance to the state park is within the boundaries of the municipality, it may be subject to real property taxation.
Title
Authorizes the taxation of certain lands owned by the state constituting a state park; provides that if the land constitutes a state park and the average daily state park attendance for the preceding year exceeded twenty-five percent of the municipal population as determined by the most recent census data; the state-owned land constitutes ten percent or more of the total land contained within the municipality; the municipality provides or pays for first responder police protection and either pays or provides for the cost of first responder fire protection or the residents of the municipality make direct payments to a fire protection district responsible for protecting the state park and its visitors; and the principal entrance to the state park is within the boundaries of the municipality, it may be subject to real property taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 967A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02615 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - print number 2615a