NY S00982 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of transportation in consultation with the department of motor vehicles to develop a program addressing the problem of wrong way drivers on New York interstate highways.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of transportation in consultation with the department of motor vehicles to develop a program addressing the problem of wrong way drivers on New York interstate highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.421 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 982A |
2021-02-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02595 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to transportation