NY S00994 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.351
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing and regulating the use of electronic bell jar vending machines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing and regulating the use of electronic bell jar vending machines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.351
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.169
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a2303c
2018-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2029
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 994C
2018-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2018-04-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 994B
2018-04-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2017-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 994A
2017-06-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2017-01-31SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A02303 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s994c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00994
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00994A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00994B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00994C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S994#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S994#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S994#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00994&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback