NY S01007 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the imposition of sales tax the purchase of military service flags, prisoner of war flags and blue star banners.
Title
Exempts from the imposition of sales tax the purchase of military service flags, prisoner of war flags and blue star banners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.477 |
2012-09-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.533 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a835a |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.880 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1007A |
2012-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00835 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s1007a