NY S01124 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on November 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-12 - SIGNED CHAP.356
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for an increase in the rates of compensation for gold star parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for an increase in the rates of compensation for gold star parents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-12AssemblySIGNED CHAP.356
2018-11-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.272
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a2799a
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-12AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1124B
2018-06-04SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-04AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-05-15Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2018-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-15SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1173
2018-05-15SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-05-24Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2017-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.739
2017-03-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-02-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 1124A
2017-02-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A02799 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s1124b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01124&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01124&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01124
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01124&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01124A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01124&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01124B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1124#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01124&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback