NY S01145 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Nurse of Tomorrow Act of 2012" to provide for grants from the state commissioner of education to public and not-for-profit hospitals, skilled nursing facilities, schools and other entities for nurse recruitment, education and retention costs and activities as described herein.
Title
Enacts the "Nurse of Tomorrow Act of 2012" to provide for grants from the state commissioner of education to public and not-for-profit hospitals, skilled nursing facilities, schools and other entities for nurse recruitment, education and retention costs and activities as described herein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-12-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1145A |
2011-12-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04204 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in higher education