NY S01151 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "hunger-free campus act" to address food insecurity among students at public and private higher education institutions.
Title
Establishes the "hunger-free campus act" to address food insecurity among students at public and private higher education institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1707 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1151C |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-10-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1151B |
2021-10-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1151A |
2021-04-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06881 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - print number 6881c