NY S01160 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that school districts may hold elections in any building owned or leased by the district, in addition to any district schoolhouse.
Title
Provides that school districts may hold elections in any building owned or leased by the district, in addition to any district schoolhouse.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.401 |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | substituted for a1390 |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
2024-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.517 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01390 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - substituted by s1160