NY S01172 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to funding for emergency management services for certain counties with non-operational nuclear power plants.
Title
Relates to funding for emergency management services for certain counties with non-operational nuclear power plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A03592 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations