NY S01178 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1178C
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 1178C
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; establishes the first violation is a warning and subsequent violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Title
Prohibits the idling of any passenger vehicle, with certain exceptions, for more than 3 consecutive minutes; establishes the first violation is a warning and subsequent violations of such section are traffic infractions punishable by a fine of $150.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1178C |
2024-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1178B |
2024-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-11-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1178A |
2023-11-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08289 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - reported referred to codes