NY S01198 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.423
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an individual in any taxable year to elect to contribute to the City University of New York (CUNY); all revenues collected shall be credited to the City University Construction Fund; the trustees of such fund shall report before the first of February each year on how such monies were utilized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows an individual in any taxable year to elect to contribute to the City University of New York (CUNY); all revenues collected shall be credited to the City University Construction Fund; the trustees of such fund shall report before the first of February each year on how such monies were utilized.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.423
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.220
2018-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a7129a
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1745
2018-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 1198A
2018-06-08SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2017-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-03-13SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07129 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s1198a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01198&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01198&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01198
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01198&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01198A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1198#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1198#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S1198#SC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01198&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback