NY S01199 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing minimum standards for payment plans for eligible customers; requires the public service commission to set standards for payment plans for certain customers including reasonableness of agreements and timelines for payment; establishes eligibility.
Title
Relates to establishing minimum standards for payment plans for eligible customers; requires the public service commission to set standards for payment plans for certain customers including reasonableness of agreements and timelines for payment; establishes eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-29 | Senate | AMENDED 1199B |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.214 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.527 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1199A |
2023-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04497 (Same As) 2024-01-05 - amended by restoring to previous print 4497b