NY S01205 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows non-violent felons to become eligible for a barber license.
Title
Allows non-violent felons to become eligible for a barber license.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Duane [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | referred to economic development | |
2010-06-15 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 | |
2010-04-12 | PRINT NUMBER 1205A | |
2010-04-12 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2009-01-27 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A6874 (Same As) 2010-06-03 - print number 6874a