NY S01205 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain taxing jurisdictions to permit individuals to have real property taxes automatically deducted from such individual's bank accounts.
Title
Authorizes certain taxing jurisdictions to permit individuals to have real property taxes automatically deducted from such individual's bank accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1231 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07997 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to real property taxation