NY S01289 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes real property taxing jurisdictions to grant a partial tax exemption for property purchased by a physician in a physician shortage area, as determined by the commissioner of health, which will be such physician's primary residence and he or she will practice in such shortage area; provides state aid to taxing jurisdictions which grant the exemption to the extent of the tax savings provided to physicians.
Title
Authorizes real property taxing jurisdictions to grant a partial tax exemption for property purchased by a physician in a physician shortage area, as determined by the commissioner of health, which will be such physician's primary residence and he or she will practice in such shortage area; provides state aid to taxing jurisdictions which grant the exemption to the extent of the tax savings provided to physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1289A |
2015-03-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07068 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - print number 7068a