NY S01414 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A259A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A259A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the commissioner of health shall approve the operating certificate of a midwifery birth center which is accredited by a recognized accrediting organization.
Title
Provides that the commissioner of health shall approve the operating certificate of a midwifery birth center which is accredited by a recognized accrediting organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A259A |
2021-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.658 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1414A |
2021-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00259 (Same As) 2021-12-31 - approval memo.161