NY S01441 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it unlawful for any person age 16 or older to knowingly possess a knife on grounds used for educational purposes.
Title
Makes it unlawful for any person age 16 or older to knowingly possess a knife on grounds used for educational purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Eric Adams [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.111 |
2011-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |