NY S01441 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows off-track betting corporations to set up special reserve funds to use as an alternative to current capital acquisition funds.
Title
Allows off-track betting corporations to set up special reserve funds to use as an alternative to current capital acquisition funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.434 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A02180 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to racing and wagering