NY S01446 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the remediation and prevention of indoor mold; requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property; requires notification to prospective lessees; directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal and the commissioner of health to promulgate rules and standards for the remediation and prevention of indoor mold.
Title
Relates to the remediation and prevention of indoor mold; requires the disclosure of indoor mold history upon the sale of certain real property; requires notification to prospective lessees; directs the commissioner of housing and community renewal and the commissioner of health to promulgate rules and standards for the remediation and prevention of indoor mold.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.294 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10895 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - referred to housing