NY S01461 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1461A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - PRINT NUMBER 1461A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to early voting in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to early voting in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1461A |
2014-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00689 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS