NY S01511 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the timing of risk level determination hearings for certain convicted sex offenders who are expected to be, upon sentencing, released on probation or discharged upon payment of a fine, conditional discharge or unconditional discharge.
Title
Relates to the timing of risk level determination hearings for certain convicted sex offenders who are expected to be, upon sentencing, released on probation or discharged upon payment of a fine, conditional discharge or unconditional discharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Flanagan [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.119 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.663 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01193 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
A09746 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to correction
A09746 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to correction