NY S01593 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the report of programs available to survivors of domestic violence.
Title
Relates to the report of programs available to survivors of domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1232 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-10-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1593B |
2013-10-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1593A |
2013-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02400 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09050 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - referred to governmental operations
A09050 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - referred to governmental operations