NY S01599 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of DEC to remove peregrine falcons from the endangered species list and to promulgate regulations for their use in falconry.
Title
Directs the commissioner of DEC to remove peregrine falcons from the endangered species list and to promulgate regulations for their use in falconry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.343 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04940 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation