NY S01600 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale of electric lamps that contain mercury in excess of specified amounts; provides exceptions and fines for violations.
Title
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale of electric lamps that contain mercury in excess of specified amounts; provides exceptions and fines for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.34 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05277 (Same As) 2013-02-22 - referred to environmental conservation