NY S01623 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1623A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1623A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that new passenger-type motor vehicles manufactured for sale in New York state on or after January 1, 2020 shall be offered for sale with a spare tire and jack.
Title
Provides that new passenger-type motor vehicles manufactured for sale in New York state on or after January 1, 2020 shall be offered for sale with a spare tire and jack.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1623A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.355 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00962 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 962a