NY S01623 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.24
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A02500 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback