NY S01656 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of non-food wine or liquor supplies, accessories and/or barware.
Title
Relates to the sale of non-food wine or liquor supplies, accessories and/or barware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1161 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1656B |
2016-04-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1656A |
2016-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2015-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A03553 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - print number 3553b