NY S01711 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-26 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-26 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession, sale, offering for sale, trade or distribution of shark fins; makes certain exceptions.
Title
Prohibits the possession, sale, offering for sale, trade or distribution of shark fins; makes certain exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.171 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.241 |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | substituted for a1769b |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | AMENDED 1711B |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.283 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1711A |
2013-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01769 (Same As) 2013-05-06 - substituted by s1711b