NY S01744 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commissaries and canteens at correctional institutions; provides that items for sale at a commissary or canteen shall be sold for market value; provides that money placed into an incarcerated individual's commissary or canteen account or fund shall only be used for purchasing items or goods.
Title
Relates to commissaries and canteens at correctional institutions; provides that items for sale at a commissary or canteen shall be sold for market value; provides that money placed into an incarcerated individual's commissary or canteen account or fund shall only be used for purchasing items or goods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.678 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05134 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means