NY S01759 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to how online dating services handle fraudulent members; requires certain disclosures.
Title
Relates to how online dating services handle fraudulent members; requires certain disclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1759B |
2023-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1759A |
2023-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01057 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION