NY S01770 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding Triborough bridge and tunnel authority peace officers to those able to conduct temporary questioning of persons.
Title
Relates to adding Triborough bridge and tunnel authority peace officers to those able to conduct temporary questioning of persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.161 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04443 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes