NY S01785 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Title
Relates to the enforcement of provisions relating to carriers of household goods by motor vehicle; authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enjoin and restrain the continuance or threat of certain violations by such carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03564 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO CODES